PA HR407 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-9)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating June 19, 2019, as "World Sickle Cell Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating June 19, 2019, as "World Sickle Cell Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-06-17 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |