PA HR420 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution calling on the United Nations to facilitate the immediate and unconditional release of National League for Democracy leader Dr. Aung San Suu Kyi and other political prisoners from continued detention by the Burmese military government; noting the release of John William Yettaw; and calling on the United States Department of State to impose strict economic sanctions against Burma (Myanmar).
Title
Calling on the United Nations to facilitate the immediate and unconditional release of National League for Democracy leader Dr. Aung San Suu Kyi and other political prisoners from continued detention by the Burmese military government; noting the release of John William Yettaw; and calling on the United States Department of State to impose strict economic sanctions against Burma (Myanmar).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-27 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-23 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-23 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-28 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-28 | Laid on the table | |
2010-02-09 | Removed from table | |
2010-02-09 | Laid on the table | |
2009-12-07 | Removed from table | |
2009-12-07 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-30 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-20 | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL AFFAIRS |