PA HR431 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Stonewall Riots in New York City.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Stonewall Riots in New York City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-25 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |