PA HR436 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15)
Status: Passed on September 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Adopted (197-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing the month of October 2019 as "National Breast Cancer Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania and October 18, 2019, as "National Mammography Day" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the month of October 2019 as "National Breast Cancer Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania and October 18, 2019, as "National Mammography Day" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HR 436 PN 2383 (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25HouseAdopted (197-0)
2019-09-23HouseReported as committed
2019-09-03HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback