PA HR448 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of September 2019 as "Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of September 2019 as "Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorders Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |