PA HR453 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing September 5, 2019, as "National Recovery Advocacy Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing September 5, 2019, as "National Recovery Advocacy Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |