PA HR456 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-23 - Adopted (199-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-23 - Adopted (199-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing September 23, 2019, as "National Falls Prevention Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing September 23, 2019, as "National Falls Prevention Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-23 - House - House Floor: HR 456 PN 2391 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-23 | House | Adopted (199-0) |
2019-09-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |