PA HR461 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution noting Smokey Bear's 75th anniversary on August 9, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Noting Smokey Bear's 75th anniversary on August 9, 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-24 - House - House Floor: HR 461 PN 2396 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-24HouseAdopted (200-0)
2019-09-18HouseReported as committed
2019-09-03HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback