PA HR464 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing the month of September 2019 as "Polycystic Kidney Disease Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the month of September 2019 as "Polycystic Kidney Disease Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HR 464 PN 2565 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A02818 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25HouseAdopted (198-0)
2019-09-23HouseReported as amended
2019-09-05HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=464
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0464&pn=2410
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0464&pn=2565
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=09/23/2019&RollCallId=1053
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=09/23/2019&RollCallId=1052
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=694

Bill Comments

feedback