PA HR470 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Adopted (49-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution recognizing October 13, 2019, as the 244th birthday of the United States Navy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Concurrent Resolution recognizing October 13, 2019, as the 244th birthday of the United States Navy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 470 PN 2422 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Floor: HR 470 PN 2422 (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25SenateAdopted (49-0)
2019-09-24SenateReported as committed
2019-09-23SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-09-23SenateIn the Senate
2019-09-23HouseAdopted (199-0)
2019-09-18HouseReported as committed
2019-09-12HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=470
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0470&pn=2422
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/18/2019&RollCallId=1037
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=662
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=512
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=269

Bill Comments

feedback