PA HR473 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating October 10, 2019, as "Put the Brakes on Fatalities Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating October 10, 2019, as "Put the Brakes on Fatalities Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HR 473 PN 2425 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2019-09-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |