PA HR479 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating October 11, 2019, as the "Day of the Girl" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating October 11, 2019, as the "Day of the Girl" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: HR 479 PN 2455 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Adopted (198-0) |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-16 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |