PA HR510 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Passed on September 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution designating October 9, 2019, as "PANS/PANDAS Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania and recognizing the need to raise awareness of pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome and pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating October 9, 2019, as "PANS/PANDAS Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania and recognizing the need to raise awareness of pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome and pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HR 510 PN 2520 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25HouseAdopted (198-0)
2019-09-23HouseReported as committed
2019-09-19HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback