PA HR519 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on January 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - Amended and Adopted (184-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing pornography as a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing pornography as a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HR 519 PN 2723 (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HR 519 PN 2723, 2017 A4997, KINSEY (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-23HouseAmended and Adopted (184-0)
2017-11-20HouseReported as committed
2017-11-20HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2723
2017-09-26HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=519
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0519&pn=2475
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0519&pn=2723
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0519&pn=2923
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1062
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=971
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=972

Bill Comments

feedback