PA HR532 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of October 2019 as "Blindness Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of October 2019 as "Blindness Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |