PA HR537 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing November 21, 2019, as "The Great American Smokeout Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing November 21, 2019, as "The Great American Smokeout Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HR 537 PN 2661 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | House | Adopted (198-0) |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to HEALTH |