PA HR544 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-17)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Adopted (197-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-17)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Adopted (197-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating November 30, 2019, as "Small Business Saturday" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating November 30, 2019, as "Small Business Saturday" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HR 544 PN 2662 (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Adopted (197-0) |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |