PA HR555 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to pass House Res. 1773, which would award the Congressional Gold Medal collectively to the women who joined the "Rosie the Riveter" campaign during World War II.
Title
Urging the Congress of the United States to pass House Res. 1773, which would award the Congressional Gold Medal collectively to the women who joined the "Rosie the Riveter" campaign during World War II.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |