PA HR559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing October 29, 2019, as "International Data Center Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing October 29, 2019, as "International Data Center Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HR 559 PN 2655 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |