PA HR561 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing November 3, 2019, as "One Health Day" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing November 3, 2019, as "One Health Day" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HR 561 PN 2663 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-19HouseAdopted (196-0)
2019-10-29HouseReported as committed
2019-10-15HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback