PA HR572 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing November 23, 2019, as "National Adoption Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing November 23, 2019, as "National Adoption Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HR 572 PN 2708 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | House | Adopted (198-0) |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |