PA HR578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating October 29, 2019, as "Amusement Park Day" in Pennsylvania to honor amusement parks and family theme parks in this Commonwealth.
Title
Designating October 29, 2019, as "Amusement Park Day" in Pennsylvania to honor amusement parks and family theme parks in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: HR 578 PN 2724 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Adopted (198-0) |
2019-10-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-21 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |