PA HR584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing October 11, 2019, as "National Coming Out Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing October 11, 2019, as "National Coming Out Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |