PA HR590 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Adopted (184-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Adopted (184-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution commemorating December 7, 2019, as "Pearl Harbor Remembrance Day."
Title
Commemorating December 7, 2019, as "Pearl Harbor Remembrance Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HR 590 PN 2770 (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Adopted (184-0) |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |