PA HR630 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-13)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-13)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Apollo 11 lunar landing mission on July 20, 2019.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Apollo 11 lunar landing mission on July 20, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HR 630 PN 2984 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-06 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |