PA HR641 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating January 23, 2020, as "Maternal Health Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania to recognize all the women who die from complications of pregnancy or childbirth.
Title
Designating January 23, 2020, as "Maternal Health Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania to recognize all the women who die from complications of pregnancy or childbirth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HR 641 PN 3022 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |