PA HR646 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging Major League Baseball to revise its plan to eliminate affiliation with three Minor League Baseball teams in Pennsylvania.
Title
Urging Major League Baseball to revise its plan to eliminate affiliation with three Minor League Baseball teams in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-02 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |