PA HR661 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of March 2020 as "Greek-American Heritage Month" in Pennsylvania and recognizing the constructive role Greek Americans continue to play in the economic and cultural development of our nation and this Commonwealth.
Title
Designating the month of March 2020 as "Greek-American Heritage Month" in Pennsylvania and recognizing the constructive role Greek Americans continue to play in the economic and cultural development of our nation and this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HR 661 PN 3123 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |