PA HR689 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating March 25, 2020, as "Greek Independence Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating March 25, 2020, as "Greek Independence Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HR 689 PN 3207 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Adopted (201-0) |
2020-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |