PA HR692 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of March 2020 as "National Social Work Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of March 2020 as "National Social Work Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: HR 692 PN 3210 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |