PA HR697 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the week of March 15 through 21, 2020, as "Sunshine Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the week of March 15 through 21, 2020, as "Sunshine Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HR 697 PN 3215 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |