PA HR706 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of March 2020 as "Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of March 2020 as "Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to HEALTH |