PA HR714 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-15)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of February 2020 as "National Cancer Prevention Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of February 2020 as "National Cancer Prevention Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HR 714 PN 3251 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |