PA HR715 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the week of February 24 through March 1, 2020, as "Eating Disorders Awareness Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the week of February 24 through March 1, 2020, as "Eating Disorders Awareness Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HR 715 PN 3252 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |