PA HR726 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the week of October 4 through 10, 2020, as "National Newspaper Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the week of October 4 through 10, 2020, as "National Newspaper Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HR 726 PN 3281 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |