PA HR727 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution commemorating the 150th anniversary of the ratification of the Fifteenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Title
Commemorating the 150th anniversary of the ratification of the Fifteenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HR 727 PN 3282 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Adopted (200-0) |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |