PA HR747 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing May 5, 2020, as "Architects Action Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing May 5, 2020, as "Architects Action Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-02 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |