PA HR757 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on September 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on September 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of April 2020 as "Limb Loss Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of April 2020 as "Limb Loss Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - House Floor: HR 757 PN 3328 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-07-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to HEALTH |