PA HR758 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on September 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on September 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of April 2020 as "Pennsylvania 8-1-1 Safe Digging Month."
Title
Designating the month of April 2020 as "Pennsylvania 8-1-1 Safe Digging Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - House Floor: HR 758 PN 3329 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |