PA HR779 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of May 2020 as "Mental Health Awareness in the Black Community Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of May 2020 as "Mental Health Awareness in the Black Community Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |