PA HR783 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution honoring the life, service and accomplishments of Congressman Elijah Cummings.
Title
Honoring the life, service and accomplishments of Congressman Elijah Cummings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |