PA HR793 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating October 5, 2020, as "Anti-bullying Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania in support of those working hard to raise awareness of bullying and prevent its occurrence.
Title
Designating October 5, 2020, as "Anti-bullying Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania in support of those working hard to raise awareness of bullying and prevent its occurrence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HR 793 PN 3403 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-09-01 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |