PA HR811 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the week of July 19 through 25, 2020, as "ADA Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the week of July 19 through 25, 2020, as "ADA Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |