PA HR822 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of April 2020 as "Child Abuse Prevention Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of April 2020 as "Child Abuse Prevention Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-01 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |