PA HR825 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-11)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the week of November 15 through 22, 2020, as "Hunger and Homelessness Awareness Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the week of November 15 through 22, 2020, as "Hunger and Homelessness Awareness Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |