PA HR841 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the observance of the Holy Month of Ramadan, a month of reflection and prayer for the Muslim community, which runs from April 23 through May 23, 2020, and the festival of Eid al-Fitr.
Title
Recognizing the observance of the Holy Month of Ramadan, a month of reflection and prayer for the Muslim community, which runs from April 23 through May 23, 2020, and the festival of Eid al-Fitr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-13 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |