PA HR848 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the week of May 10 through 16, 2020, as "National Women's Lung Health Week" in Pennsylvania and encouraging all residents of this Commonwealth to learn more about the detection and treatment of lung cancer.
Title
Recognizing the week of May 10 through 16, 2020, as "National Women's Lung Health Week" in Pennsylvania and encouraging all residents of this Commonwealth to learn more about the detection and treatment of lung cancer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to HEALTH |