PA HR849 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-17)
Status: Passed on April 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-17)
Status: Passed on April 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating April 19 through 26, 2020, as "Days of Remembrance of the Victims of the Holocaust" and recognizing April 21, 2020, as "Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating April 19 through 26, 2020, as "Days of Remembrance of the Victims of the Holocaust" and recognizing April 21, 2020, as "Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HR 849 PN 3577 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |