PA HR855 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-29 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-29 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of March 2020 as "Problem Gambling Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania and recognizing the month of March 2020 as "National Problem Gambling Awareness Month."
Title
Designating the month of March 2020 as "Problem Gambling Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania and recognizing the month of March 2020 as "National Problem Gambling Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |