PA HR857 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution commemorating September 2, 2020, as "V-J Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Commemorating September 2, 2020, as "V-J Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-30 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |